Howard v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Howard
Defendant: Landstar Ranger Inc and Derrick Dewayne Harris
Case Number: 2:2020cv00556
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa C Taylor terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 06/11/2020. (CLS2)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Melissa Croxton Taylor Motion is RIPE 6/11/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Robert Michael Howard. (Taylor, Melissa)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge John H England, III. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Landstar Ranger Inc.(Arnwine, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Michael Howard. Landstar Ranger Inc served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (stamped received by CT Corporation) (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Derrick Dewayne Harris, Landstar Ranger Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
April 29, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3581168. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Derrick Dewayne Harris, Landstar Ranger Inc, filed by Robert Michael Howard.(KAM). (Gorham, Robert)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Robert Michael Howard. (KAM)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Derrick Dewayne Harris, Landstar Ranger Inc, filed by Robert Michael Howard.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Ranger Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Dewayne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Howard
Represented By: Robert L Gorham
Represented By: Melissa C Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?