Hawkins v. Broadband Technical Resources
Plaintiff: Erskine Hawkins
Defendant: Broadband Technical Resources
Case Number: 2:2020cv00566
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration #6 is GRANTED IN PART, in accordance with the court's practice and the parties' agreement, the court DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of the prevailing party to reopen to enforce any arbitration award; each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/10/2020. (KAM)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Broadband Technical Resources. (Nixon, Brooke)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erskine Hawkins. Erskine Hawkins served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Goldfarb, Jon)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/18/2020. (KAM)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Broadband Technical Resources.(Nixon, Brooke)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Broadband Technical Resources del to plaintiff (KAM)
April 27, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B46-01105568 (KAM)
April 27, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3578774. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Broadband Technical Resources, filed by Erskine Hawkins.(KAM). (Goldfarb, Jon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broadband Technical Resources, filed by Erskine Hawkins.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Broadband Technical Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erskine Hawkins
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadband Technical Resources
Represented By: Brooke M Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?