Taunton v. Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shequetta Beckham Taunton
Defendant: Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00616
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc. delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shequetta Beckham Taunton. filed by Shequetta Beckham Taunton (Landreau, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3584029 (ALND receipt# B4601105735). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc., filed by Shequetta Beckham Taunton.(SRD). (Landreau, Matthew) Modified on 5/5/2020 (AKD).
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc., filed by Shequetta Beckham Taunton.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taunton v. Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shequetta Beckham Taunton
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?