Griffin et al v. Benefytt Technologies Inc et al
Plaintiff: William James Griffin and Ashley Lawley
Defendant: Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc, Benefytt Technologies Inc and Health Insurance Innovations Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00630
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to motion to dismiss by William James Griffin, Ashley Lawley. (Johnstone, F)
July 2, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3622357 (ALND receipt# B4601106888). (Brown, W) Modified on 7/2/2020 (AKD).
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Sheehan by William James Griffin, Ashley Lawley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Sheehan in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Brown, W)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 06/29/2020. (AKD)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:20-cv-630-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. The status conference set for July 6, 2020 is CANCELLED. (MRR, )
June 5, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3603670 (ALND receipt# B4601106369). (Gilchrist, Wesley) Modified on 6/5/2020 (AKD).
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy H. Lee Motion is RIPE 6/5/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilchrist, Wesley)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The motions seeking leave for David L. Balser and Zachary A. McEntyre to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendants in this action (Docs. #10 , #11 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/2/20. (MRR, )
June 2, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3600824 (ALND reciept# B4601106272). (Gilchrist, Wesley) Modified on 6/2/2020 (AKD).
June 2, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3600821 (ALND reciept# B4601106271). (Gilchrist, Wesley) Modified on 6/2/2020 (AKD).
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Zachary A. McEntyre Motion is RIPE 6/1/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilchrist, Wesley)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David L. Balser Motion is RIPE 6/1/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilchrist, Wesley)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 16, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 16, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on July 6, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/27/20. (MRR, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The defendants have filed an unopposed motion to extend their deadline to respond to the complaint by thirty days. (Doc. #6 ). The motion is GRANTED. The defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) on or before July 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/27/20. (MRR, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by William James Griffin as to Benefytt Technologies Inc. (JLC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 5/21/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Lawley. Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (MRR, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by William James Griffin, Ashley Lawley. (Johnstone, F)
May 5, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3584529 (B4601105760). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc, filed by Ashley Lawley, William James Griffin.(MRR, ). (Johnstone, F) Modified on 5/5/2020 (MRR, ).
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benefytt Technologies Inc, Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc, filed by Ashley Lawley, William James Griffin.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Benefytt Technologies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Griffin
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Represented By: Matthew F Carroll
Represented By: W Tucker Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Lawley
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Represented By: Matthew F Carroll
Represented By: W Tucker Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings Inc
Represented By: David Balser
Represented By: Timothy H Lee
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Zachary A McEntyre
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefytt Technologies Inc
Represented By: David Balser
Represented By: Timothy H Lee
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Zachary A McEntyre
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Insurance Innovations Inc
Represented By: David Balser
Represented By: Timothy H Lee
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Zachary A McEntyre
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?