Barnett et al v. Bentzen et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas Barnett, Jr and David Michael Loper
Defendant: Patrick Bentzen and Rhonda Bentzen
Case Number: 2:2020cv00637
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/2/2020. (KAM)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a disrict judge after August 17, 2020 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge; Telephone Conference set for July 29, 2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; The parties are DIRECTED to dial 866-390-1828 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins. The access code is 9262283. The telephone conference will be canceled by separate order if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/2/2020. (KAM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Patrick Bentzen, Rhonda Bentzen.(Collins, Philip)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Patrick Bentzen answer due 7/6/2020; Rhonda Bentzen answer due 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 06/30/2020. (RCP)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Patrick Bentzen, Rhonda Bentzen. (Collins, Philip) Modified on 6/30/2020 (KAM, ).
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Thomas Barnett, Jr, David Michael Loper. Patrick Bentzen served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Rhonda Bentzen served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (MRR, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Alias Summons Issued as to Patrick Bentzen, Rhonda Bentzen, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Joseph Thomas Barnett, Jr, David Michael Loper. (Bethay, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Patrick Bentzen, Rhonda Bentzen., returned to pltf in SASE for service (MRR, )
May 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601105790 (MRR, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Thomas Barnett, David Michael Loper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett et al v. Bentzen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Bentzen
Represented By: Philip R Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Bentzen
Represented By: Philip R Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas Barnett, Jr
Represented By: John D Bethay, III
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Represented By: Katharine A Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Loper
Represented By: John D Bethay, III
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Represented By: Katharine A Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?