Siniard v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Lisa Siniard
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00643
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Lisa Siniard, Life Insurance Company of North America. The telephone conference set for July 29, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED (KAM)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/25/2020. (KAM)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a District Judge after August 10, 2020 unless the parties unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge; Telephone Conference set for July 29,2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties are DIRECTED to dial 866-390-1828 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins; The access code is 9262283; The telephone conference will be canceled by separate order if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/25/2020. (KAM)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall file its response to the complaint on or before June 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 06/02/2020. (RCP)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace) Modified text on 6/2/2020 (MRR, ).
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Siniard. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (MRR, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America via certified U.S. Mail on this the 11th day of May 2020. (JLC)
May 7, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3586098, NDAL receipt #B4601105817. (Pennington, John) Modified on 5/11/2020 (JLC).
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lisa Siniard. (MRR, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Lisa Siniard.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siniard v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Siniard
Represented By: John M Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?