Flowers v. AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan et al
Plaintiff: Tara Flowers
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc and AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00644
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/1/2020; Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 09:30 AM; Bench Trial set on 01/10/2022 at 9:00 a.m. BOTH at Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 07/01/2020. (AKD)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT -The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:20 CV 644 AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc (Mays, Stephanie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.(Mays, Stephanie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan (Mays, Stephanie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan.(Mays, Stephanie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Flowers. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020 (green card not signed or dated). (AKD)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Britney Heath McDonald, but with the understanding and on the condition she pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless she has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/2/2020. (AVC)
June 2, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3600986 (ALND receipt# B4601106274). (Burke, Peter) Modified on 6/2/2020 (AKD).
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Britney Heath McDonald Motion is RIPE 6/2/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tara Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Burke, Peter)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Flowers. AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (AKD)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan and Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 18th day of May 2020. (JLC)
May 8, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3586653 (B4601101105823). related document #1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan and Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, filed by Tara Flowers.(AKD). (Burke, Peter) Modified on 5/8/2020 (MRR, ).
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tara Flowers. (Burke, Peter)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan and Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, filed by Tara Flowers.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Flowers
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Represented By: Stephanie H Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Southeast Disability Benefits Program Plan
Represented By: Stephanie H Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?