Forte v. Medical Data Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Deboris Forte
Defendant: Medical Data Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00744
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems Inc. delivered to plaintiff for service (AKD)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deboris Forte. filed by Deboris Forte (Landreau, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge John H England, III. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 2, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3601175. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems Inc, filed by Deboris Forte.(KAM). (Landreau, Matthew)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems Inc, filed by Deboris Forte.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forte v. Medical Data Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deboris Forte
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?