Parsons v. Pettway et al
Plaintiff: James W Parsons, III
Defendant: Mark Pettway and Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00806
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Sheriff Mark Pettway's #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Pettway. (Gilbert, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MRR, ).
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 Defendant Pettway's MOTION to Dismiss filed by James W Parsons, III. (Ozment, James) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MRR, ).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/13/2020. (FNC)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.(Ireland, Horace)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule on MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Pettway. Doc. #10 . Response due within 14 days of the date of this order; reply due within 7 days of the date that the response is filed. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/6/20. (MRR, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Mark Pettway. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Gilbert, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Gilbert on behalf of Mark Pettway (Gilbert, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Stewart on behalf of Mark Pettway (Stewart, James)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John G Dana on behalf of Mark Pettway (Dana, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce L Gordon on behalf of Mark Pettway (Gordon, Bruce)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James W Parsons, III. Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (MRR, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James W Parsons, III. Mark Pettway served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Ozment, James)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mark Pettway, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
June 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3607961 (B4601106527). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc, Mark Pettway, filed by James W Parsons, III.(KEK). (Ozment, James) Modified on 6/11/2020 (MRR, ).
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc, Mark Pettway, filed by James W Parsons, III.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. Pettway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pettway
Represented By: John G Dana
Represented By: Jonathan David Gilbert
Represented By: James A Stewart
Represented By: Bruce L Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Represented By: James Michael Cooper
Represented By: Horace Cecil Ireland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Parsons, III
Represented By: Michele Elaine Pate
Represented By: R Taylor Abbot, Jr
Represented By: James Franklin Ozment
Represented By: Andrew C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?