KGS Steel Inc v. McCandless et al
Plaintiff: KGS Steel Inc
Defendant: Bentley Steel Inc and Randall A Duke
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Houston McCandless
3Rd Party Defendant: Gaston Stein
Case Number: 2:2020cv00816
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Bentley Steel, Inc. moves to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2). (Doc. #14 ). On or before August 12, 2020, KGS Steel, Inc. shall file a response; Bentley Steel may file a reply on or before August 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/30/2020. (KEK)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bentley Steel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L Pantazis on behalf of KGS Steel Inc (Pantazis, Patrick)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Corley on behalf of Houston McCandless (Corley, Jonathan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Gaston Stein, COUNTERCLAIM against KGS Steel Inc by Houston McCandless.(Knight, Sam)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #9 ). Defendant Bentley Steel, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint on or before 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/13/2020. (YMB)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bentley Steel Inc. (Johnson, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KGS Steel Inc. Houston McCandless served on 7/3/2020, answer due 7/24/2020. (KEK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KGS Steel Inc. Bentley Steel Inc served (no date on green card). (KEK)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KGS Steel Inc. Randall A Duke served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (KEK)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Houston McCandless. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bentley Steel Inc, Randall A Duke. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by KGS Steel Inc. (Lowell, Craig)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/16/2020. (KEK)
June 10, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3606942 (ALND B4601106484) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bentley Steel Inc, Randall A Duke, Houston McCandless, filed by KGS Steel Inc.(KEK). (Lowell, Craig) Modified on 6/10/2020 (KEK).
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bentley Steel Inc, Randall A Duke, Houston McCandless, filed by KGS Steel Inc.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KGS Steel Inc v. McCandless et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentley Steel Inc
Represented By: John S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall A Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KGS Steel Inc
Represented By: David C Skinner
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Represented By: Patrick L Pantazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Houston McCandless
Represented By: Sam David Knight
Represented By: Lance Leroy Goodson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gaston Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?