Jones v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Felicity Jones
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00826
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint #5 . For good cause shown, the Motion #5 is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before August 12, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/21/2020. (KAM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felicity Jones. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (KAM)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America mailed certified mail (KAM)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Felicity Jones. (Burke, Peter)
June 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3608176. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Felicity Jones.(KEK). (Burke, Peter)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Felicity Jones.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicity Jones
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?