Callins v. FIS Management Services LLC
Plaintiff: Deana Callins
Defendant: FIS Management Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00854
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Before this Court is Plaintiff's motion requesting an extension of time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. #6 The motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by August 19, 2020. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/15/2020. (PSM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Deana Callins. (Arnold, Allen)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deana Callins. FIS Management Services LLC served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (AKD)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FIS Management Services LLC. mailed certified mail (KAM)
June 16, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3611286 (ALND receipt# B4601106599). related document #1 COMPLAINT against FIS Management Services LLC, filed by Deana Callins.(PSM). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 6/16/2020 (AKD).
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Deana Callins. (PSM)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Deana Callins (PSM)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIS Management Services LLC, filed by Deana Callins.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callins v. FIS Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIS Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Callins
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?