Howell v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Audrey L Howell
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00993
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc answer due 10/9/2020; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD answer due 10/9/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc answer due 10/9/2020. (MRR, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The unopposed motion seeking an extension of the responsive pleading deadline applicable to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., is GRANTED. (Doc. #19 ). These defendants SHALL respond to the complaint by October 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/31/20. (MRR, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 8/14/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (Walker, Thomas)
August 11, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Janssen Ortho LLC answer due 10/9/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 10/9/2020; Janssen Research & Development LLC answer due 10/9/2020; Johnson & Johnson answer due 10/9/2020; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 10/9/2020. (MRR, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The defendants which have appeared have filed an unopposed motion seeking to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #16 ). The motion is GRANTED; the appearing defendants SHALL respond to the complaint by October 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/11/20. (MRR, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 7/22/2020, answer due; STAMPED CT CORPORATION 8/12/2020. (MEB2)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion is RIPE 8/4/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bussian, James)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Presently pending are the motions seeking to allow Tracie J. Renfroe, R. Bruce Hurley, and Kristen R. Fournier to appear pro hac vice on behalf of five defendants: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Research & Development, LLC; Janssen Ortho, LLC; and Johnson & Johnson. (Docs. #7 , #8 , #9 ). The motions, which are accompanied by the required fees and provide the information specified under Local Rule 83.1, are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/29/20. (MRR, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (MRR, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (MEB2)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/24/2020 (no date on green card), answer due 8/14/2020. (MRR, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (MRR, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (MRR, )
July 24, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number (B4601107336) (MRR, )
July 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3635636 (B4601107335). (Bussian, James) Modified on 7/24/2020 (MRR, ).
July 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3635630 (B4601107334). (Bussian, James) Modified on 7/24/2020 (MRR, ).
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristen R. Fournier Motion is RIPE 7/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bussian, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Bruce Hurley Motion is RIPE 7/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bussian, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tracie J. Renfroe Motion is RIPE 7/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bussian, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Janssen Research & Development LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (MRR, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey L Howell. Janssen Ortho LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (MRR, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
July 15, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3630260 (B4601107187). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, filed by Audrey L Howell.(KEK). (Jones, Robert) Modified on 7/16/2020 (MRR, ).
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Audrey L Howell. (Jones, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, filed by Audrey L Howell.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Represented By: R Bruce Hurley
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Tracie J Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Thomas E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD
Represented By: Thomas E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Represented By: R Bruce Hurley
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Tracie J Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Represented By: R Bruce Hurley
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Tracie J Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Represented By: R Bruce Hurley
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Tracie J Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Represented By: R Bruce Hurley
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Tracie J Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Represented By: Thomas E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey L Howell
Represented By: Lauren Sanderson Miller
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Robert Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?