Vaughn OD EMBA et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: Vaughns Family Vision LLC d/b/a Advanced Eye Care and Alexia C Vaughn OD EMBA
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA d/b/a Matsco
Case Number: 2:2020cv00997
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER addressing the Deft's Opposed Motion for Leave to File its Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses and Initial Disclosures (Doc #13 ); Counsel are ORDERED to confer and attempt to resolve their discovery dispute; The court will rule on the motion only if any party files a statement certifying that, after personal consultation and sincere efforts to do so, counsel have been unable to resolve this matter satisfactorily; Unless such a statement is filed on or before Friday, September 18, 2020, the court will consider Defendant's motion for leave moot and deny it on that ground. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 9/8/20. (MRR, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File its Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses and Initial Disclosures; Notice of Service of Discovery Responses filed by Alexia C Vaughn OD EMBA, Vaughns Family Vision LLC. (Loder, Lee) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (MRR, ).
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File its Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses and Initial Disclosures by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Ex,. 3 Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Email Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Proposed Order)(Hayslip, Victor)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of Wells Fargo's #9 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Hayslip, Victor) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (MRR, ).
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Strike /Opposed Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand filed by Alexia C Vaughn OD EMBA, Vaughns Family Vision LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Loder, Lee)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule on MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Doc. #9 . Response due within 14 days of the date of this order; reply due within 7 days of the date that the response is filed. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/30/20. (MRR, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike /Opposed Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Equipment Financing Agreement, #2 Exhibit Modification Agreement, #3 Exhibit Secured Guaranty)(Hayslip, Victor)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER- Certain deadlines and instructions apply as further set out within including: Discovery due by 12/18/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2021, Trial ready April 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 23, 2020. A Status Conference is set for Wednesday, December 2, 2020 at 2:00 PM by Zoom. The court will provide the participating information to the parties by e-mail, one week prior to the conference. This order governs further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/24/20. (MRR, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hayslip, Victor)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices I, II, & III attached. This order governs all further proceedings in this court. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/20/20. (MRR, )
July 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Vaughns Family Vision LLC (Loder, Lee)
July 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Alexia C Vaughn OD EMBA, Vaughns Family Vision LLC.(Loder, Lee)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Alexia C Vaughn OD EMBA, Vaughns Family Vision LLC by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Equipment Financing Agreement)(Hayslip, Victor)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank NA. filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Hayslip, Victor)
July 13, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3628333 (ALND receipt# B4601107146). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-902198, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Hayslip, Victor) Modified on 7/13/2020 (AKD).
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-902198, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn OD EMBA et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughns Family Vision LLC d/b/a Advanced Eye Care
Represented By: Lee W Loder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexia C Vaughn OD EMBA
Represented By: Lee W Loder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA d/b/a Matsco
Represented By: Victor L Hayslip
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?