Capstone On-Campus Management LLC v. Hanover Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Capstone On-Campus Management LLC
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 2:2020cv01005
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company, The (Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Weber on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company, The (Weber, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 3/31/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2021; Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/19/20. (SAC)
August 14, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3650953 (ALND B4601107811). (Gumbiner, Krysta) Modified on 8/17/2020 (KEK).
August 14, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3650932 (ALND B4601107812). (Weber, Michael) Modified on 8/17/2020 (KEK).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #7 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner contingent upon payment of the $75.00 pro hac vice fee within 7 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/12/20. (SAC)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Michael J. Weber contingent upon payment of the $75.00 pro hac vice fee within 7 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/12/20. (SAC)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ialacci, Brett)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Krysta K. Gumbiner by Hanover Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Admission)(Isenberg, Joel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Weber by Hanover Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Admission)(Isenberg, Joel)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/23/20. (SAC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hanover Insurance Company, The.(Isenberg, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capstone On-Campus Management LLC. filed by Capstone On-Campus Management LLC (Ialacci, Brett)
July 15, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3630080 (ALND B4601107186) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hanover Insurance Company, The from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-902163, filed by Hanover Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Isenberg, Joel) Modified on 7/15/2020 (KEK).
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hanover Insurance Company, The. (KEK)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hanover Insurance Company, The from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-902163, filed by Hanover Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capstone On-Campus Management LLC v. Hanover Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capstone On-Campus Management LLC
Represented By: Brett Andrew Ialacci
Represented By: Lance Leroy Goodson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company, The
Represented By: A Mark Bahakel
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Michael J Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?