McMath v. Medical Transport of Alabama LLC
Plaintiff: Jerome D McMath
Defendant: Medical Transport of Alabama LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01022
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee by Jerome D McMath. (MRR, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Alias Summons Issued as to Medical Transport of Alabama LLC. mailed certified mail (MEB2)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jerome D McMath as to Medical Transport of Alabama LLC. (MRR, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Medical Transport of Alabama LLC. mailed certified mail (MEB2)
July 23, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3634929 (B4601107313). related document #1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Medical Transport of Alabama LLC, filed by Jerome D McMath.(MRR, ). (Haynes, Kenneth) Modified on 7/23/2020 (MRR, ).
July 17, 2020 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Jerome D McMath. (MRR, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Medical Transport of Alabama LLC, filed by Jerome D McMath.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMath v. Medical Transport of Alabama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Transport of Alabama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome D McMath
Represented By: Kenneth D Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?