Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC v. Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC
Petitioner: Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC
Respondent: Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01161
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Request for service by certified mail filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC. (LeMoine, Robert)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC as to Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC. (MRR, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC. (LeMoine, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3648908 (B4601107757). related document #1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO SECTION 4 OF THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT against Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC, filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC.(MRR, ). (LeMoine, Robert) Modified on 8/12/2020 (MRR, ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO SECTION 4 OF THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT against Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC, filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC v. Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Laboratory Analysis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Robert Edward LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?