Bell v. Motley
Plaintiff: Miss DeKorrie K Bell and DeKorrie K Bell
Defendant: Motley, Mr. Motley, CAPS Downtown Birmingham and Mr. King
Case Number: 2:2020cv01194
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL In accordance with the order entered by the Court (doc. #7 ), filed September 28, 2020, the court hereby ORDERS that this action shall be, and is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/28/2020. (SRD)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons stated within, Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/28/2020. (SRD)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery by DeKorrie K Bell. (MEB2)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAPS Downtown Birmingham, Mr. King, Mr. Motley, filed by DeKorrie K Bell.(MEB2)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The Court rules as follows: (1) a ruling on Bell's IFP application is DEFERRED pending a showing that this action is not subject to dismissal; and (2) Bell is ORDERED to file an amended complaint correcting the pleading deficits noted herein, and including her specific claims and specific allegations that relate to each of these claims, by September 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/3/2020. (SRD)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing: Exhibit in support of #1 COMPLAINT by DeKorrie K Bell (MEB2)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DeKorrie K Bell. (MEB2)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motley, filed by DeKorrie K Bell.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPS Downtown Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miss DeKorrie K Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeKorrie K Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?