Alexander Shunnarah LLC v. Charter Communications Operating LLC
Plaintiff: Alexander Shunnarah LLC doing business as Alexander Shunnarah Injury Lawyers
Defendant: Charter Communications Operating LLC as successor in interest to Bright House Networks LLC doing business as Spectrum Enterpise
Case Number: 2:2020cv01196
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - the court, having been informed that the parties are proceeding to arbitration in this case, DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/18/2020. (KAM)
September 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 9/18/2020. As discussed, the court will enter a separate Order of Remand. (KLL)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion to Dismiss #3 and Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court #4 . This case is SET for a telephonic conference on September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/17/2020. (KAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alexander Shunnarah LLC. (Nolen, Rodney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY THE INSTANT ACTION by Charter Communications Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hair, Barry)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/19/2020. (KAM)
August 19, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601107870 (MEB2)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charter Communications Operating LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-92554., filed by Charter Communications Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Shunnarah LLC v. Charter Communications Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Operating LLC as successor in interest to Bright House Networks LLC doing business as Spectrum Enterpise
Represented By: Barry W Hair
Represented By: Eric D Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Shunnarah LLC doing business as Alexander Shunnarah Injury Lawyers
Represented By: Rodney E Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?