Bell v. Birmingham Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: DeKorrie K Bell
Defendant: Carver Washington High School and Birmingham Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2020cv01200
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL ORDER - In accordance with the accompanying memorandum opinion, the court DISMISSES the amended complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/14/2020. (KEK)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Because the amended complaint does not assert any federal claims, the court lacks federal question jurisdiction over the case. Moreover, the amended complaint does not assert or show that the court has diversity jurisdiction. Accordingly, the court WILL DISMISS this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/14/2020. (KEK)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 Order filed by DeKorrie K Bell. (KEK)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by DeKorrie K Bell. (KEK)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing: letter to the court by DeKorrie K Bell. (KEK)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Accordingly, the court DENIES AS MOOT the request to proceed in forma pauperis because Ms. Bell is already proceeding in forma pauperis. The court DENIES the request for appointment of counsel because the facts and legal issues presented by this case are not "so novel or complex as to require the assistance of a trained practitioner." Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/15/2020. (KEK)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DeKorrie K Bell. (KEK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:20 CV 1200 ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE- Due to these case-specific circumstances, the undersigned has determined he will likely not be able to obtain consent in this action. Therefore, consistent with the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 09/11/2020. (AKD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Birmingham Board of Education, filed by DeKorrie K Bell.(AKD)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING #2 Motiont o Appoint Counsel; Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint bearing this case number (2:20-cv-1200-JHE) on the first page within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 08/20/2020. (AKD)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint bearing this case number (2:20-cv-1200-JHE) on the first page within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 08/20/2020. (AKD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing defendants addresses by DeKorrie K Bell (AKD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action (AKD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/19/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DeKorrie K Bell. (AKD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Birmingham Board of Education, Carver Washington High School, filed by DeKorrie K Bell.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Birmingham Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeKorrie K Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Washington High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?