Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc et al v. MCoal Corp.
Plaintiff: Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc and Friends of the Locust Fork River
Defendant: MCoal Corp.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01211
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc, Friends of the Locust Fork River as to MCoal Corp. Mail Returned as Unable to forward (MEB2)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc, Friends of the Locust Fork River. (KEK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc, Friends of the Locust Fork River. MCoal Corp. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (MEB2)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MCoal Corp. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/26/2020. (KEK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:20-cv-1211-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECUSAL ORDER - The undersigned hereby recuses herself from further participation in the above-styled action. The clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this case to another judge in accordance with the clerk's normal procedure. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/26/2020. (KEK)
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3654428, NDAL receipt #B4601107897. (Dillard, Eva) Modified on 8/20/2020 (JLC).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc., Friends of the Locust Fork River. (JLC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc., Friends of the Locust Fork River. (JLC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MCoal Corp., filed by Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc., Friends of the Locust Fork River. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc et al v. MCoal Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Warrior River-Keeper, Inc
Represented By: Eva L Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Locust Fork River
Represented By: Eva L Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCoal Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?