Lewis v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lewis
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01228
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ronald Lewis. (Loder, Lee)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Ronald Lewis Filing of Disclaimer on Behalf of Ditech (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclaimer)(Loder, Lee)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to re #8 Court Ordered Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Reeves, T)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 Brief re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Assignment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Coronado Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Singh Complaint)(Reeves, T)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Reeves, T)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 Brief re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Assignment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Coronado Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Singh Complaint)(Reeves, T)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Reeves, T)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected Exhibit--SJIS Case Detail. (Reeves, T)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Defendants are directed to file a brief response, not to exceed 5 pages, addressing the new arguments raised in #10 Plaintiff's reply under subsection's (1) and (2). Defendants' brief is due September 25, 2020. The Court will consider this motion submitted upon filing of this brief. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/18/2020. (SRD)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Ronald Lewis. (Loder, Lee)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Reeves, T)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Ronald Lewis. (Loder, Lee)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Second ANSWER to Complaint by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.(Lee, Arthur)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Shores Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Arthur)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/28/2020. (SRD)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Reeves, T)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Reeves, T)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 3. (Reeves, T)
August 24, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3656719. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2018-000253.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3)(SRD). (Reeves, T)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2018-000253.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Joseph Vincent Ronderos
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Joseph Vincent Ronderos
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Arthur Shores Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lewis
Represented By: Lee W Loder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?