King Fred Property Management LLC v. Birmingham, Alabama, City of
Plaintiff: King Fred Property Management LLC
Defendant: Birmingham, Alabama, City of
Case Number: 2:2020cv01270
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/25/2021. Status Conference set for Monday, 6/14/2021 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/21/2020. (YMB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fullerton, Frederic)
September 1, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601108108. (KEK)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/31/2020. (KEK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Birmingham, Alabama, City of.(Fullerton, Frederic)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Birmingham, Alabama, City of from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-902724, filed by Birmingham, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Fred Property Management LLC v. Birmingham, Alabama, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Frederic L Fullerton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Fred Property Management LLC
Represented By: Richard A Bearden
Represented By: Cindy Self Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?