Grimes v. White et al
Plaintiff: John Grimes
Defendant: Joshua White, Wells Fargo and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv01344
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Jurisdictional Challenge with Affidavit filed by John Grimes. (MEB2)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - In light of the potential application of the Rooker-Feldman Doctrine to Plaintiff's claims in this case, it is ORDERED as follows: 1. The Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Wells Fargo and Fannie Mae (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Discovery in this action is hereby STAYED until the court resolves the pending Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #4 , #11 ). 2. On or before November 6, 2020, Plaintiff SHALL SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be dismissed because the Rooker-Feldman doctrine deprives the court of jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/22/2020. (KEK)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B White on behalf of Joshua White (White, Joshua)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Joshua White. (White, Joshua)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:20 CV 1344 RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
October 13, 2020 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for November 5, 2020 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- Defendants Wells Fargo and Federal National Mortgage Association have moved to stay discovery pending a ruling on their motion to dismiss, #4 , #8 . Any opposition to that motion is due by October 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/07/2020. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Federal National Mortgage Association, Wells Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Springfield, R)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/07/2020. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 20, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 20, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for November 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/07/2020. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss- Plaintiffs response is due by October 20, 2020. Defendants reply, if any, is due by October 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/07/2020. (AKD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support by Federal National Mortgage Association, Wells Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from Previous Action)(Springfield, R)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association, Wells Fargo, Joshua White delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
September 11, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601108397 (AKD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, Wells Fargo, Joshua White, filed by John Grimes.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua White
Represented By: Joshua B White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Represented By: R Frank Springfield
Represented By: Denzel Efemena Okinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: R Frank Springfield
Represented By: Denzel Efemena Okinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?