Brasher v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Plaintiff: William Brasher
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv01410
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 20109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on November 20, 2020. (ASL)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden filed by William Brasher, Norfolk Southern Railway Co; The telephone conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:45 a.m. is CANCELLED (KAM)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:45 AM on Thursday, November 19, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Corey B. Kronzer's #10 motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Brasher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/12/2020. (SUH)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION PHV Admission Corey B. Kronzer by William Brasher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Tucker, William)
November 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3713542 (B4601109633). (Tucker, William) Modified on 11/12/2020 (MEB2).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Marc T. Wietzke's #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Brasher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/9/2020. (SUH)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Pro Hac Vice Admission of Marc T. Wietzke by William Brasher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Tucker, William)
November 9, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3711256. (Tucker, William)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 - The parties are reminded to conduct a conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/23/2020. (KEK)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 4, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after December 4, 2020. A telephone status conference is SET for 10:45 a.m. on November 19, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to dial 866-390-1828 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins. The access code is 9262283. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/23/2020. (KEK)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.(Frazier, Sydney)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Brasher. Norfolk Southern Railway Co served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (MEB2)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Co. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
September 23, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3676910. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Co, filed by William Brasher.(KEK). (Tucker, William)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by William Brasher. (KEK)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Co, filed by William Brasher.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brasher v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brasher
Represented By: William C Tucker, Jr
Represented By: Corey Kronzer
Represented By: Marc T Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?