Evans v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Stephen Evans
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01531
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices I, II, and III attached. This order governs all further proceedings in this court. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/30/20. (MRR, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #5 . Def Life Insurance Company of North America's responsive pleading is now due on or before November 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/3/2020. (FNC)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Evans. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (MRR, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Stephen Evans. (Burke, Peter)
October 6, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3687429 (B4601108905). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Stephen Evans.(MRR, ). (Burke, Peter) Modified on 10/6/2020 (MRR, ).
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Stephen Evans.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Matthew S Edinger
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Evans
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?