City of Tarrant, Alabama v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Tarrant, Alabama
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SPECGX LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Noramco, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation and Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 2:2020cv01534
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL; Copies of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk emailed to the Clerk of Court of the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/22/2020. (JLC)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC (Gamble, William)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: If the case has not been transferred to the MDL on or before Wednesday, January 6, 2021 (90 days from today's date), the court orders the parties to submit a Joint Status Report updating the court on the status of the transfer. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/08/2020. (MPN)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE as set out herein. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/7/2020. (JLC)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Berdy, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2020-903149.00., filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit 1-4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)
October 2, 2020 COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, filed by City of Tarrant, Alabama. (Deemed filed 9/9/2020 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit 1).(JLC)
October 2, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3685913(B4601108826). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2020-903149.00., filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-1, # 3 Exhibit 1-2, # 4 Exhibit 1-3, # 5 Exhibit 1-4, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC). (Berdy, Christopher) Modified on 10/5/2020 (MEB2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Tarrant, Alabama v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Berdy
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Berdy
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Tarrant, Alabama
Represented By: Hirlye Ray Lutz, III
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Brett C Thompson
Represented By: Adam W Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?