O'Shea v. OMi Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: James O'Shea
Defendant: Robert M Bunnel, Tom Codiana, OMi Holdings Inc and Hoist Parts Inc doing business as OMi Crane Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv01616
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Defendants OMi Holdings, Inc., and Hoist Parts, Inc., have filed an unopposed motion seeking an extension of time until December 21, 2020, to file a response to the plaintiff's complaint. (Doc. #11 ). For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. The moving defendants SHALL file their response to the plaintiff's amended complaint on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/2/20. (MRR, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hoist Parts Inc. filed by Hoist Parts Inc (Redmond, Wesley)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OMi Holdings Inc. filed by OMi Holdings Inc (Redmond, Wesley)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Hoist Parts Inc answer due 12/21/2020; OMi Holdings Inc answer due 12/21/2020. (MRR, )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION- OMi Holdings, Inc. and Hoist Parts, Inc.s Request for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #9 Motion is RIPE 12/1/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Hoist Parts Inc, OMi Holdings Inc. (Redmond, Wesley) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (MRR, ).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James O'Shea as to Robert M Bunnel. (MRR, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James O'Shea.(Jackson, Edward)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- The pltf is ORDERED to amend the complaint within fourteen (14) calendar days, to correct the deficiencies in the jurisdictional allegations discussed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/2/20. (MRR, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James O'Shea. Hoist Parts Inc served on 10/24/2020, answer due 11/14/2020. (MRR, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James O'Shea. Hoist Parts Inc served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (MRR, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to defendants Hoist Parts, Inc, Tom Codiana, Robert Bunnell, OMi Holdings, Inc by James O'Shea. (KEK)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert M Bunnel (3), Tom Codiana (3), Hoist Parts Inc (4), OMi Holdings Inc (1), sent via certified mail. (MRR, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by James O'Shea. (Jackson, Edward)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601109097 (MRR, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James O'Shea.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Shea v. OMi Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Bunnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Codiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMi Holdings Inc
Represented By: Susan W Bullock
Represented By: Wesley C Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoist Parts Inc doing business as OMi Crane Services
Represented By: Susan W Bullock
Represented By: Wesley C Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Shea
Represented By: Judson B Allen
Represented By: Edward R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?