Hillman v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Plaintiff: Victoria Hillman
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01625
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 6/28/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2021; Joint Status Report due by 5/28/2021. The parties shall be ready for trial in April 2022, to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/12/20. (SAC)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Pearce, Julie)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pearce, Julie)
October 28, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3703899 (B4601109311). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-903176, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State court complaint, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Pearce, Julie) Modified on 10/28/2020 (MEB2).
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(Pearce, Julie)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/20/20. (SAC)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-903176, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court complaint, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillman v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Hillman
Represented By: Jaime C Erdberg
Represented By: Mark David Erdberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Julie Davis Pearce
Represented By: Amanda Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?