Cromwell v. Fails
Petitioner: Harrison Cromwell
Respondent: Darryl Fails
Case Number: 2:2020cv01735
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Darryl Fails. (KAM)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned RECOMMENDS the Court DISMISS the petition for writ of habeas corpus WITHOUT PREJUDICE to allow Cromwell an opportunity to petition the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals for authorization to file a successive petition pursuant to 2244(b)(3)(A). Objections to R&R due by 1/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/17/2020. (MEB2)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Harrison Cromwell. (MEB2)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Petitioner shall have 20 days from the entry of this order to file a response to the court's Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/14/2020. (KAM) (KAM, ).
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response re #2 Order to Show Cause by Harrison Cromwell. (MEB2)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the entry date of this Order, why his petition should not be dismissed due to Petitioners failure to obtain the requisite authorization from the court of appeals for the filing of the petition; Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr 12/4/2020. (KAM) Modified on 12/4/2020 (KAM, ).
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 ALND receipt number B4601109473), filed by Harrison Cromwell. (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cromwell v. Fails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harrison Cromwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darryl Fails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?