Banks v. Peters et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Leroy K. Banks
Defendant: A. Adams, Kenneth Peters, Captain Johnson, Phyllis Morgan and Captain Scott
Case Number: 2:2020cv01829
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION- The undersigned RECOMMENDS this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/4/21. (MRR, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- The pltf failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee. The pltf must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/19/20. (MRR, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00577. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 16, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/17/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This lawsuit is before the court on the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge that the case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404. (Doc. #2 .) There being no timely objections filed to the Recommendation, and upon an independent review of the record and upon consideration of the Recommendation, it is ORDERED that: (1) The Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (Doc. #2 ) is ADOPTED. (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this action. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/17/2020.]
September 10, 2020 No objections filed to the #2 recommendation. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/17/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/14/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/17/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against A. Adams, Captain Johnson, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Captain Scott, filed by Leroy K. Banks.(NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(hrs, ) Modified on 8/11/2020 to correct def Phyllis Morgan (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Peters et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy K. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?