Spencer v. Franklin American Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: David C Spencer
Defendant: Citizens Bank NA doing business as Citizens One Home Loans and Franklin American Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2020cv02019
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sears, Shane)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Citizens Bank NA, Franklin American Home Mortgage. (Beckett, Amanda)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Presently pending are two motions: (1) the defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. #4 ); and (2) the plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. #6 ). The plaintiff has responded to the motion to dismiss (Doc. #11 ), and the defendants have responded to the motion to remand (Doc. #7 ). However, these responses were filed before the entry of the Initial Order. (Doc. #12 ). In accordance with the Initial Order, and out of an abundance of caution, any reply to either motion must be filed within seven (7) calendar days of the entry of this order. Future motions will not prompt a separate briefing order; briefing deadlines are provided in the Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/26/21. (MRR, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/26/2021. (BST, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff filed by David C Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sears, Shane)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. The status conference set for January 25, 2021 is CANCELLED(MRR, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 6, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 6, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on January 25, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/13/21. (MRR, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/17/2021; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/13/2021. (BST)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff filed by Citizens Bank NA, Franklin American Home Mortgage. (Beckett, Amanda)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff by David C Spencer. (Sears, Shane)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Beckett, Amanda)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Citizens Bank NA, Franklin American Home Mortgage. (Beckett, Amanda)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Bank NA, Franklin American Home Mortgage. filed by Citizens Bank NA, Franklin American Home Mortgage (Beckett, Amanda)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2020-903782., filed by Citizens Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ) Modified to correct filer on 12/17/2020 (MRR, ).
December 16, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3736436 (B4601110304). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2020-903782., filed by Franklin American Home Mortgage. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ). (Beckett, Amanda) Modified on 12/16/2020 (MEB2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Franklin American Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank NA doing business as Citizens One Home Loans
Represented By: Amanda M Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin American Home Mortgage
Represented By: Amanda M Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C Spencer
Represented By: Shane T Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?