CRM Motors Inc v. America's Auto Auction Birmingham Inc et al
Plaintiff: CRM Motors Inc
Defendant: Ardmore Auto Sales LLC, McClary Ford Lincoln-Mercury Inc, Holly Automotive LLC, Stogner Management I Inc, America's Auto Auction Birmingham Inc and Peggy Ivey
Case Number: 2:2021cv00094
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Joint Motion for an Extension. The defendants' deadline to file their responsive pleadings are EXTENDED to on or before March 19, 2021, or twenty-one days after service of the summons and complaint, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/18/21. (MRR, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension by America's Auto Auction Birmingham Inc, Peggy Ivey, CRM Motors Inc., McClary Ford Lincoln-Mercury, Inc (Macoy, Cecil) Modified text and added filers on 2/18/2021 (MRR, ).
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to America's Auto Auction Birmingham Inc, Ardmore Auto Sales LLC, Holly Automotive LLC, Peggy Ivey, McClary Ford Lincoln-Mercury Inc, Stogner Management I Inc., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
January 21, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3758356 (B4601110948). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CRM Motors Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MRR, ). (Donald, Thomas) Modified on 1/21/2021 (MRR, ).
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CRM Motors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRM Motors Inc v. America's Auto Auction Birmingham Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardmore Auto Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClary Ford Lincoln-Mercury Inc
Represented By: Robert B Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stogner Management I Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Auto Auction Birmingham Inc
Represented By: Cecil H Macoy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Ivey
Represented By: Cecil H Macoy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRM Motors Inc
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C. Donald
Represented By: Thomas C Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?