Envirocare LLC v. Envirospray LLC
Plaintiff: Envirocare LLC
Defendant: Envirospray LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00216
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 23, 2021. (ASL)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Envirocare LLC. (Tomlinson, Frank) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (MRR, ).
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden filed by Envirocare LLC, Envirospray LLC; the Telephone Conference set for 3/17/2021 is CANCELLED (KAM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:15 AM on Wednesday, March 17, 2021; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled(ASL)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 Opposition to re #5 Motion to Remand filed by Envirospray LLC. (Browning, Charles)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Envirospray LLC. (Browning, Charles)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #5 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff. Defendant shall file a response to the motion on or before March 18, 2021, and Plaintiff may file a reply on or before March 25, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 03/04/2021. (STH)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Envirocare LLC. (Tomlinson, Frank)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Envirocare LLC. (Tomlinson, Frank)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by the magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 3, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after April 3, 2021. A telephone status conference with the magistrate judge is hereby SET for 10:15 AM on Wednesday, March 17, 2021. The parties are directed to call 866-390-1828 access code 9262283 at designated time. The conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/19/2021. (KEK)
February 18, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3779704. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Envirospray LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 21-900147., filed by Envirospray LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(KAM). (Browning, Charles) NDAL rec# B4601111551 Modified on 2/22/2021 (KAM).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before March 3, 2021, and Defendant may file a reply on or before March 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 02/17/2021. (STH)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Envirospray LLC. (Browning, Charles)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Envirospray LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 21-900147., filed by Envirospray LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Envirocare LLC v. Envirospray LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envirocare LLC
Represented By: Frank H Tomlinson
Represented By: Phillip G Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envirospray LLC
Represented By: Charles Brandon Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?