Davis v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Donald Davis
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00272
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE-Consistent with the parties Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice, #13 ,this matter is now DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/12/2021. (AKD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff and by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maughan, Diane)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated; Richard B. North Jr. terminated. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/10/2021. (AKD)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03501. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER - Granting Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the stipulation of dismissal without prejudice of the above Plaintiffs (Doc. 20988 in lead case 15-md-2641) is granted. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/5/19. (SLQ) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03501-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16959939 filed by Donald Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Davis
Represented By: Clint Reed
Represented By: Basil E Adham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?