Ingle v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Laura M Ingle
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00275
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to stay (doc. #26 ) and STAYS all deadlines in this case until August 19, 2021; the parties SHALL file a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report on or before that date. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/21/2021. (KEK)
April 20, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay by Laura M Ingle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chermack, Kelly)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - The court adopts as if entered originally by this court the protective and case management orders attached as Exhibits A, B, C, D, and E. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/5/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(SAC)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Fact discovery deadline is December 28, 2021; All discovery to be completed by March 28, 2022; Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2022; Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2022. The parties shall be ready for trial in January 2023, to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/5/21. (SAC)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #21 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney for Taylor T. Daly contingent upon payment of the $75.00 pro hac vice fee within 7 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/23/21. (SAC)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #20 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney for Brandee J. Kowalzyk contingent upon payment of the $75.00 pro hac vice fee within 7 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/23/21. (SAC)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803672. (Morris, George)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803659. (Morris, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #13 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/10/21. (SAC)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Attorney Richard B. North, Jr.'s, motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc., and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Doc. #16 ). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/10/2021. (KEK)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER - The court CANCELS the Telephone Conference set for March 12, 2021, 11:30 AM. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/10/21. (SAC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of Laura M Ingle (Conlin, Jon)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rule 26(f) Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Rule 26(f) Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Rule 26(f) Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Rule 26(f) Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Rule 26(f) Report)(Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura M Ingle. (Chermack, Kelly)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Telephone Conference for March 12, 2021, 11:30 AM, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Counsel will receive the numbers needed to join the call via an e-mail from the court. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/8/21. (SAC)
March 8, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3792096. (Chermack, Kelly)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:21 CV 275 ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
March 4, 2021 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for March 15, 2021 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 25, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 25, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on March 15, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/22/21. (MRR, ) . Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/22/21. (MRR, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03149. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03149-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16919071 filed by Laura M Ingle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingle v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M Ingle
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?