Keene v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Keene
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00276
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Stay and Status Report. (Doc. #20 ). The Court grants the Motion to Stay. Discovery and all pretrial deadlines are stayed until 8/2/2021, to allow the parties to finalize settlement documents. On or before 8/2/2021, the parties shall please file a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/2/2021. (YMB)
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
March 26, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay and Status Report by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Daly, Taylor)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 03/24/2021. (SUH)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated & C R Bard Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 03/24/2021. (SUH)
March 24, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden: Telephone Conference held on 3/24/2021; Attorney Debra Humphrey for pla; Attorney Taylor Daly for defts. (ASL)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803673. (Morris, George)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803654. (Morris, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 19, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings (see order #15 ): Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. (ASL)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the deadline for the parties to enter an election regarding consent (Doc. 12) is CONTINUED to April 2, 2021; Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-390-1828 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 9262283. The telephone conference will be cancelled if a joint stipulation is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/10/2021. (KAM)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Richard B. North Jr.'s #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 03/10/2021. (SUH)
March 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/10/2021; Attorney Debra Humphrey present for pla; Attorneys Diane Maughan & Taylor Daly for defts (ASL)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 19, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 19, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on March 10, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-390-1828 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 9262283. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/26/21. (MRR, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is SET for 10:30 a.m. on March 10, 2021. The parties are directed to dial 866-390-1828 and enter access code 9262283 no less than five minutes prior to the start of the call. If the parties encounter technical problems connecting to the call, please contact chambers directly.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 02/26/2021. (SUH)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-03996. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21025 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-03996-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14814109 filed by Thomas Keene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keene v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Keene
Represented By: Debra J Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?