Powell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jonathon Powell
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00277
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Rule 26(f) Report, Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay. (Doc. #19 ). The Court grants the motion to stay this action for 90 days to allow the parties time to finalize the settlement. On or before July 9, 2021, the parties shall please file a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/8/2021. (YMB)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay and Rule 26 Report and Notice of Settlement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Daly, Taylor)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathon Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermack, Kelly)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Brandee Kowalzyk's motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #16 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/25/2021. (YMB)
March 25, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 25, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3804600. (Morris, George)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Taylor T. Daly's motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #14 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/23/2021. (YMB)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803675 (B4601112206). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (MRR, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Richard B. North, Jr's motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this action. (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/10/2021. (YMB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of Jonathon Powell (Conlin, Jon)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of Jonathon Powell (Conlin, Jon)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This action has returned to this district from MDL proceedings. The Court sets this matter for a telephone status conference at 1:00 p.m. CST on April 12, 2021. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the conference. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/2/2021. (KEK)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02353. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2353-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16772838 filed by Jonathon Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Powell
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?