Warren et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Warren and Shelia Warren
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00278
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly Chermack. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/22/2021. (AKD)
April 22, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3824206 (ALND receipt# B4601112827). (Chermack, Kelly) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AKD).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Stay Case-This matter is STAYED for 120 days. The court ORDERS that the parties shall file a formal stipulation of dismissal or status update by August 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/21/2021. (AKD)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay by Cecil Warren, Shelia Warren. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chermack, Kelly)
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cecil Warren, Shelia Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermack, Kelly)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 , #13 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for BrandeeJ. Kowalzyk and Taylor T. Daly. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/26/2021. (AKD)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803647 (ALND receipt# B4601112198). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (AKD).
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803678 (ALND receipt# B4601112207). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (AKD).
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated; Richard B. North Jr. terminated. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/10/2021. (AKD)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of Cecil Warren, Shelia Warren (Conlin, Jon)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04181. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-4181-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16985154 filed by Shelia Warren, Cecil Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Warren
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Warren
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?