Cunningham v. AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Teqelia Cunningham
Defendant: AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00311
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0151 ta
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is AmeriFinancial Solutions, LLC ("AmeriFinancial")'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer #7 . In that Motion, AmeriFinancial seeks a deadline extension of until May 7, 2021, to file a responsive pleading. #7 . For good cause shown, the Motion #7 is GRANTED. AmeriFinancial SHALL respond to Plaintiffs Complaint #1 on or before Friday, May 7, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/26/2021. (KAM)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC. filed by AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC (Moore, Neal)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC. (Moore, Neal)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teqelia Cunningham. AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (KAM)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC delivered to USM (KAM)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/2/2021. (KAM)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE re Request for Electronic Noticing by Teqelia Cunningham. (KEK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teqelia Cunningham. (KEK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC, filed by Teqelia Cunningham.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teqelia Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriFinancial Solutions LLC
Represented By: Neal D Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?