Norfleet v. Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Norfleet
Defendant: Barbara Coleman, Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC, Task Force Maintenance Inc and Edward Coleman, II
Case Number: 2:2021cv00327
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Task Force Maintenance Inc by Brenda Norfleet. (KEK)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Eddco Maintenance Contractors Inc, Edward Coleman II, and Barbara Coleman by Brenda Norfleet. (KEK)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Barbara Coleman, Edward Coleman, II, Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC, Task Force Maintenance Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail as to Edward Coleman, II filed by Brenda Norfleet. (Jackson, Jody) Modified on 3/22/2021 (KEK).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail as to Barbara Coleman filed by Brenda Norfleet. (Jackson, Jody) Modified on 3/22/2021 (KEK).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail as to Task Force Maintenance Inc filed by Brenda Norfleet. (Bubbett Jackson, Mary) Modified on 3/22/2021 (KEK).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail as to Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC filed by Brenda Norfleet. (Bubbett Jackson, Mary) Modified on 3/22/2021 (KEK).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3789056. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Barbara Coleman, Edward Coleman, II, Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC, Task Force Maintenance Inc, filed by Brenda Norfleet. (Attachments: # 1 FLSA Consent Form)(KEK). (Jackson, Jody)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barbara Coleman, Edward Coleman, II, Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC, Task Force Maintenance Inc, filed by Brenda Norfleet. (Attachments: #1 FLSA Consent Form)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfleet v. Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddco Maintenance Contractors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Task Force Maintenance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Coleman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Norfleet
Represented By: Jody F Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?