Hines v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Nopazzo Hines
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2021cv00366
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER- Certain deadlines and instructions apply as further set out within including: Joint status report due by 9/27/21, Discovery due by 10/15/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2021, Trial ready April 2022. A Status Conference is set for Monday, October 4, 2021 at 2:00 PM, by Zoom.. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/28/21. (MRR, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/14/2021. (FNC)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:21 CV 366 AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
April 14, 2021 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for May 5, 2021 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 04/06/2021. (AKD)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than May 20, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after May 20, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:30 a.m. on May 5, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/5/21. (MRR, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Iwana Rademaekers, but with the understanding and on the condition she pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless she has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/5/2021. (AVC)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Iwana Rademaekers filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) Modified text on 4/5/2021 (MRR, ). Modified on 4/5/2021 (AVC).
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Robinett, Matthew)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Robinett, Matthew)
April 5, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3811663 (B4601112438). (Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 4/5/2021 (MRR, ).
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nopazzo Hines. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (AKD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
March 10, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3794813 (ALND receipt# B4601111981). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Nopazzo Hines. (MEB2). (Williams, Miles) Modified on 3/10/2021 (AKD).
March 9, 2021 Request for service by certified mail filed by Nopazzo Hines, as stated in Complaint #1 . (MEB2)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Nopazzo Hines. (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Represented By: Matthew Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nopazzo Hines
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?