U S Specialty Insurance Company v. Trawick Contractors Inc
Plaintiff: U S Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Trawick Contractors Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00378
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Edward P. Meyerson's motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this action. (Doc. #9 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/6/2021. (YMB)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Trawick Contractors Inc. (Meyerson, Edward)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U S Specialty Insurance Company. Trawick Contractors Inc waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Stiff, L)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee (MRR, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:21-cv-378-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Non-Party Discovery Motion is RIPE 3/18/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by U S Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to E)(Stiff, L)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS by Trawick Contractors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garrison, Kevin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trawick Contractors Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
March 11, 2021 Request for service by certified mail filed by U S Specialty Insurance Company, as stated in the Complaint #1 . (MEB2)
March 11, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B4601112006 (MRR, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trawick Contractors Inc, filed by U S Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U S Specialty Insurance Company v. Trawick Contractors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trawick Contractors Inc
Represented By: Edward P Meyerson
Represented By: Kevin R Garrison
Represented By: Vincent G Nelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U S Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: L Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?