City Gear LLC v. Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: City Gear LLC
Defendant: Zion Rootswear LLC and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00459
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #6 . The answer to the complaint is now due on or before July 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 5/27/2021. (FNC)
May 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anna M Manasco: Status Conference held on 5/27/2021. (FNC)
May 27, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc answer due 7/7/2021; Zion Rootswear LLC answer due 7/7/2021. (MRR, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. Status Conference set for Thursday, May 27, 2021 at 01:00 PM by Zoom before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the zoom information to the parties by email. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 5/24/2021. (FNC)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Third MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Doc. #4 is GRANTED. Based on good cause shown, Defendants are GRANTED until June 7, 2021 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/26/2021. (FNC)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell)
April 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc answer due 6/7/2021; Zion Rootswear LLC answer due 6/7/2021. (MRR, )
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint [Doc. #2 ] is GRANTED. Based on good cause shown, Defendants are GRANTED a 30-day extension to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/2/21. (MRR, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (MRR, ).
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2021-900551., filed by Zion Rootswear LLC, Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MRR, )
March 30, 2021 COMPLAINT against Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC, filed by City Gear LLC.-Deemed filed 2/19/21, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.7 combined pdf)(MRR, )
March 30, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3808585 (B4601112344). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2021-900551., filed by Zion Rootswear LLC, Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(MRR, ). (O'Rear, Howell) Modified on 3/31/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Gear LLC v. Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zion Rootswear LLC
Represented By: Howell Griffith O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc
Represented By: Howell Griffith O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Gear LLC
Represented By: Brooke Raylynn Watson
Represented By: Ellen T Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?