Crooks et al v. Murrow's Transfer Inc
Plaintiff: Ruth Crooks and Wanda Malcom
Defendant: Murrow's Transfer Inc
Intervenor: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00507
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 Remand letter sent to Circuit Court of Jefferson County first class mail. (AKD)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REMANDING CASE-For the reasons explained in the accompanying memorandum opinion, #14 , Ruth Crookss and Wanda Malcoms motions to remand, #8 and #9 , are GRANTED. This action is REMANDED back to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 05/21/2021. (AKD)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 05/21/2021. (AKD)
May 20, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wanda Malcom. (Lyons, Champ)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ruth Crooks. (Lyons, Champ)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court , #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Murrow's Transfer Inc. (Saunders, Anna)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER-The court has for consideration Ruth Crooks and Wanda Malcoms motions to remand. #8 , #9 . Murrows Transfer, Inc.s response to the motions is due by May 17, 2021. Crooks and Malcoms reply, if any, is due by May 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 05/12/2021. (AKD)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Wanda Malcom. (Lyons, Champ)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ruth Crooks. (Lyons, Champ)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #4 Motion to Dismiss; First, if any party objects to Geicos motion, they have until May 14, 2021 to file a response, and Geicos reply, if any, is due by May 19, 2021. Murrow Transport must confer with the plaintiffs before filing a motion to dismiss to give them an opportunity to amend the complaint. Should they choose to do so, the plaintiffs have until May 10, 2021 to amend the complaint.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/23/2021. (AKD)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:21 CV 507 AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline re #4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response is due by May 3, 2021. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by May 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 4/19/2021. (CDG)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Murrow's Transfer Inc. (DeLisle, Sara)
April 12, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601112619 (AKD)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action (AKD)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Murrow's Transfer Inc (AKD)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Murrow's Transfer Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County AL, case number 01-CV-2021-900712.00., filed by Murrow's Transfer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Removal)(AKD)
April 9, 2021 Motion to Intervene deemed filed in Jefferson County Circuit Court by Geico Casualty Company on 3/30/2021 (AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crooks et al v. Murrow's Transfer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Crooks
Represented By: Champ Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Malcom
Represented By: Champ Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murrow's Transfer Inc
Represented By: Anna Cerise Saunders
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth DeLisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Lucy W Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?