O'Mary v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Anna O'Mary
Defendant: Aronov Realty Management Inc, Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Management Inc, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Group Life & Dependent Life Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Managemet Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00540
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices I, II, and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/8/21. (MRR, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARONOV REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC; GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY INSURANCE FOR EMPLOYEES OF ARONOV REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC, and GROUP LIFE & DEPENDENT LIFE INSURANCE FOR EMPLOYEES OF ARONOV REALTY MANAGMENT, INC- Plaintiff's claims against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company remain before the court. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/8/21. (MRR, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER. Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Companys motion for admission pro hac vice, Docs. #8 & #10 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/8/2021. (FNC)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Aronov Realty Management, Inc., Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Management, Inc. and Group Life and Dependent Life Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Management, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Anna O'Mary (Robinett, Matthew) Modified docket text and added filer on 6/8/2021 (MRR, ).
June 7, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Robinett, Matthew)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 Supplemental MOTION for Limited Admission by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to the Northern District of Alabama's Local Rule 83.1, Iwana Rademaekers is ORDERED to supplement the pending motion for admission pro hac vice on or before JUNE 10, 2021, to provide the telephone number, fax number, and email address of the applicant, as well as a statement that the applicant is in good standing and eligible to practice in all courts to which she is admitted. Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company's answer deadline is EXTENDED to JUNE 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/7/21. (MRR, )
June 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 6/10/2021. (MRR, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission for Iwana Rademaekers and Designation of Local Counsel on Behalf of the Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) Modified docket text on 6/2/2021 (MRR, ).
June 2, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3854732 (B4601113705). (Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 6/2/2021 (MRR, ).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion Regarding Deadline For All Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint, Doc. #5 , is GRANTED. The defendants' responsive pleadings are due on or before JUNE 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 5/25/21. (MRR, )
May 25, 2021 Set Deadlines: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 6/7/2021. (MRR, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Robinett, Matthew)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint as to all defendants, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 5/25/2021 (FNC).
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna O'Mary. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (MRR, )
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna O'Mary. Aronov Realty Management Inc served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Group Life & Dependent Life Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Managemet Inc served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Management Inc served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (MRR, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aronov Realty Management Inc, Group Life & Dependent Life Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Managemet Inc, Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Management Inc, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
April 20, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3822779 (B4601112793). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anna O'Mary. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(MRR, ). (Stansberry, Amanda) Modified on 4/21/2021 (MRR, ).
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anna O'Mary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(MRR, )
April 19, 2021 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Anna O'Mary. (MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Mary v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna O'Mary
Represented By: Amanda Lane Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aronov Realty Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Robinett
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Life & Dependent Life Insurance for Employees of Aronov Realty Managemet Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?