Stewart v. Drummond Company Inc
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eric Stewart
Defendant: Drummond Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00675
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER By email, the parties have advised the Court that they have conferred and agree that this matter should be dismissed with prejudice. Accordingly, the Court dismisses this matter with prejudice, costs taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/15/2021. (KAM)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Drummond Company, Inc. has filed a Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #3 ). Mr. Stewart shall please respond to the Motion on or before 6/14/2021; Drummond may file a reply on or before 6/25/2021. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/1/2021. (YMB)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Drummond Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Labor Agreement)(Pennington, James)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Drummond Company Inc. filed by Drummond Company Inc (Pennington, James)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Drummond Company Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-901141, filed by Drummond Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and all other pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Case Action Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Notice re Notice of Removal)(KEK) Modified docket text on 5/14/2021 (KEK).
May 14, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3839809. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Drummond Company Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-901141, filed by Drummond Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Case Action Summary, # 3 Exhibit C - Notice re Notice of Removal)(KEK). (Pennington, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Drummond Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eric Stewart
Represented By: Champ Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drummond Company Inc
Represented By: David Carl Williams, Jr.
Represented By: James C Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?