Sims v. Blocton et al
Plaintiff: Angelik Sims
Defendant: Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, Kathryn E Thompkins, Jefferson County, Domestic Relations Court, Judge Nakita Blocton and Dr. Alan Blotcky
Case Number: 2:2021cv00677
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the purpose of service, Ms. Sims is ORDERED to file the addresses of the defendants within ten (10) calendar days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/8/21. (MRR, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST BY PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING by Angelik Sims (MRR, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE- Address for service by Angelik Sims (MRR, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angelik Sims.(MRR, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Judge Nakita Blocton, Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, Domestic Relations Court, Jefferson County, Kathryn E Thompkins, filed by Angelik Sims.(MRR, )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEAL the complaint. (Doc. 1). Ms. Sims is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within seven (7) calendar days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/17/21. (MRR, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 5/14/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Angelik Sims. (MRR, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Judge Nakita Blocton, Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, Domestic Relations Court, Jefferson County, Kathryn E Thompkins, filed by Angelik Sims.(MRR, )**Sealed pursuant to Order Doc 4** on 5/17/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Blocton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E Thompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domestic Relations Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Nakita Blocton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alan Blotcky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelik Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?