America's Frontline Doctors, etc. et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Miller, Julie Bloom, Matt Schweder, Steven M Roth, Jody Sobczak, Deborah Sobczak, America's Frontline Doctors, etc., Jennifer Greenslade, Andrea McFarlane, Lyle Bloom, Dr. Scott Jensen, Vidiella, America's Frontline Doctors, Andrea McFarlane, RN, Steven M Roth, MD, Joel Wood, RPH, Brittany Galvin, Aubrey Boone, Snow Mills, Jennifer McCrae, RN, Angellia Deselle, Kristi Simmonds, Shawn Skelton, Sally Geyer, Maria Meyers, Kari Hibbard, Julie Roberts, RN, Amy Hunt, Richard Kennedy and Estate of Dovi Sanders Kennedy
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Black & White Partnerships, US Department of Health and Human Services, Dr. Anthony Fauci, Dr. Janet Woodcock, Food and Drug Administration, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, National Institute of Health and National Institute of Allergies and Infectious Diseases
Case Number: 2:2021cv00702
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 - Because the Court cannot use Rule 41(a) as the Plaintiffs wish, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion. To accomplish the same task, Plaintiffs may seek leave to amend their Complaint under Rule 15, id., and the Court invites them to do so. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 9/3/2021. (KEK)
August 28, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss via rule 41(a) by America's Frontline Doctors. (Becraft, Lowell)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - This case comes before the court on the parties' joint motion to set a briefing schedule (doc. #19 ). The court GRANTS the motion (doc. #19 ) and sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction: Defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss and brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is due on or before September 16, 2021. Defendants' brief shall not exceed 45 pages. The court will hold a telephone status conference on September 21, 2021 at 9:30 AM Central Time. Counsel should call (877) 873-8018 and use access code 6714714 to participate. During the call, the court will discuss whether a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction is necessary. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated brief in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss and reply brief in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before October 15, 2021. Plaintiffs' brief shall not exceed 45 pages. Defendants shall file a reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before November 5, 2021. Defendants' brief shall not exceed 25 pages. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 8/24/2021. (KEK)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Set a Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) by Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Food and Drug Administration, National Institute of Allergies and Infectious Diseases, National Institute of Health, US Department of Health and Human Services. (Long, Don)
July 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hace vice Jonathan Diener by America's Frontline Doctors. (Becraft, Lowell)
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for certified mail served on Most defendants on July 6, 2021, filed by America's Frontline Doctors. (Becraft, Lowell)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: the Court will not enter a briefing schedule for the motion for preliminary injunction #15 until after all parties have been served and appear. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/22/2021. (SRD)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by America's Frontline Doctors. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Affidavit)(Becraft, Lowell)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Anthony Fauci, Food and Drug Administration, National Institute of Allergies and Infectious Diseases, National Institute of Health, US Department of Health and Human Services, Janet Woodcock, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to plaintiffs for service. (MEB2)
June 24, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number H4601004842 (MEB2)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting (Docs. #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #11 ) Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/16/2021. (SRD)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac C Belfer on behalf of Xavier Becerra, US Department of Health and Human Services (Belfer, Isaac)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear for all plaintiffs (Jenkins) by America's Frontline Doctors, etc.. (Becraft, Lowell)
June 15, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75.00, receipt number B4601114034 for F. Ronald Jenkins (Doc. #11 ) (MEB2)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT (Original) against All Defendants, filed by America's Frontline Doctors, etc..(Becraft, Lowell)
June 3, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75.00, receipt number B4601113723 for Robert J. Gargasz (Doc. #6 ) (MEB2)
June 3, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75.00, receipt number B4601113724 for Michael A. Hamilton (Doc. #7 ) (MEB2)
June 3, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75.00, receipt number B4601113728 for Thomas B. Renx (Doc. #8 ) (MEB2)
June 3, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75.00, receipt number B4601113729 for N. Ana Garner (Doc. #9 ) (MEB2)
June 3, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75.00, receipt number B4601113722 for Joseph S. Gilbert (Doc. #5 ) (MEB2)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear for all plaintiffs for N. Ana Garner by America's Frontline Doctors, etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing (Garner))(Becraft, Lowell) Modified docket text on 6/3/2021 (MRR, ).
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear for all plaintiffs (Titled for Michael Hamilton content states for Thomas Brindley Renz) by America's Frontline Doctors, etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing (Renz))(Becraft, Lowell) Modified docket text on 6/3/2021 (MRR, ).
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear for all plaintiffs for Michael A. Hamilton by America's Frontline Doctors, etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing (Hamilton))(Becraft, Lowell) Modified docket text on 6/3/2021 (MRR, ).
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear for all plaintiffs for Robert J. Gargasz by America's Frontline Doctors, etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of good standing)(Becraft, Lowell) Modified docket text on 6/3/2021 (MRR, ).
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear for all plaintiffs for Joseph S. Gilbert by America's Frontline Doctors, etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Becraft, Lowell) Modified docket text on 6/3/2021 (MRR, ).
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Harlow on behalf of Xavier Becerra, US Department of Health and Human Services (Harlow, James)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for TRO. The court has reviewed the Doctors' motion and finds no specific facts in the motion or attached affidavits that clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to the [Doctors] before [the Government Defendants] can be heard in opposition. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(A). So the court DENIES the Doctors' motion for temporary restraining order (doc. #1 ). Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/24/2021. (SRD)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Don B Long, III on behalf of Xavier Becerra, US Department of Health and Human Services (Long, Don)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by America's Frontline Doctors, etc., Julie Bloom, Lyle Bloom, Jennifer Greenslade, Scott Jensen, Andrea McFarlane, Ellen Miller, Steven M Roth, Matt Schweder, Deborah Sobczak, Jody Sobczak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit J-A, #12 Exhibit K)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: America's Frontline Doctors, etc. et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Miller
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bloom
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Schweder
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Roth
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Sobczak
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sobczak
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America's Frontline Doctors, etc.
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Greenslade
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea McFarlane
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Bloom
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Scott Jensen
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vidiella
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America's Frontline Doctors
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea McFarlane, RN
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Roth, MD
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Wood, RPH
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Galvin
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Boone
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snow Mills
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer McCrae, RN
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angellia Deselle
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Simmonds
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Skelton
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Geyer
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Meyers
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Hibbard
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Roberts, RN
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hunt
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kennedy
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Dovi Sanders Kennedy
Represented By: F Ronald Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph S Gilbert
Represented By: Lowell H Becraft, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Hamilton
Represented By: N Ana Garner
Represented By: Robert J Gargasz
Represented By: Thomas B Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Isaac C Belfer
Represented By: James William Harlow
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & White Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Isaac C Belfer
Represented By: James William Harlow
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Anthony Fauci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Janet Woodcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Health
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Allergies and Infectious Diseases
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?