MAG Industries Ltd v. Nouman
Plaintiff: MAG Industries Ltd
Defendant: Khurram Nouman, Aziz A Majeed and Elements Distribution LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00786
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff MAG Industries, Ltd.'s, motion for leave to conduct discovery. (Doc. #26 ). Defendant Elements Distribution, LLC, SHALL serve written responses to the discovery requests attached to Plaintiff's motion (doc. #26 -1) on or before August 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/3/2021. (KEK)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Elements Distribution LLC by MAG Industries Ltd. (MRR, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Discovery by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mathews, Ellen)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE by MAG Industries Ltd re #24 Summons Issued, #23 Amended Complaint (Mathews, Ellen) Modified docket text on 7/30/2021 (MRR, ).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Elements Distribution LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mathews, Ellen) Modified docket text on 7/20/2021 (KEK).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff MAG Industries, Ltd.'s, unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint. (Doc. #21 ). Plaintiff SHALL file the amended complaint separately on the docket on or before July 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/20/2021. (KEK)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mathews, Ellen)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/7/21. (SAC)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff MAG Industries, Ltd.'s, motions for leave to conduct limited discovery. (Docs. #3 , #9 ). Defendants Khurram Nouman and Aziz A. Majeed SHALL serve written responses to the discovery requests attached to Plaintiff's motions (docs. #3 -1, #9 -1) on or before July 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/7/2021. (KEK)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Watson, III on behalf of All Defendants (Watson, Joseph)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (doc. #16 ), the court LIFTS the temporary restraining order (doc. #13 ) and ENTERS A PRELIMINARY INJUCNTION that restrains and enjoins Defendants Khurram Nouman and Aziz A. Majeed under the same terms as the temporary restraining order. Further, the court CANCELS the June 24, 2021 hearing on this matter. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/22/2021. (KEK)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by MAG Industries Ltd. filed by MAG Industries Ltd (Mathews, Ellen)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff MAG Industries, Ltd.'s motion for an extension of time. (Doc. #14 ). Plaintiff's brief in support of a preliminary injunction is due on or before June 22, 2021, at 3:00 PM. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/22/2021. (KEK)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Injunction Brief by MAG Industries Ltd. (Mathews, Ellen)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***LIFTED*** MEMORANDUM OPINION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER- The court GRANTS MAG Industries, Ltd's, motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc #10 ). The Defendants Khurram Nouman and Aziz A. Majeed are RESTRAINED and ENJOINED as outlined within. MAG is not required to post a bond at this time. This temporary restraining order will expire on July 1, 2021. A hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction is set for June 24, 2021, at 1:00 pm in courtroom 6B of the Hugo L. Black Courthouse. MAG's brief in support of a preliminary injunction is due on or before June 21, 2021; Defendants' brief in response is due on or before June 23, 2021. The Court will revisit the issue of a bond at the hearing. The court DIRECTS MAG to serve Defendants with a copy of the order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/17/21. (MRR) Modified on 6/22/2021 (KEK).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:21-786-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER- Pursuant to the January 2, 2015 General Order, "any case in which a temporary restraining order or other emergency relief is sought" is excluded from civil cases assigned to magistrate judges. Accordingly, this case is now due to be reassigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/16/21. (MRR, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letters to Hurram and Majeed, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mathews, Ellen)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Aziz Majeed, #2 Exhibit Order)(Mathews, Ellen)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAG Industries Ltd. Aziz A Majeed served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Mathews, Ellen)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAG Industries Ltd. Khurram Nouman served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Mathews, Ellen)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aziz A Majeed, Khurram Nouman, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protected Trade Dress, #2 Exhibit B - Infringing Products, #3 Exhibit C - Photographs)(Mathews, Ellen) Modified docket text on 6/10/2021 (MRR, ).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Khurram Nouman, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Discovery / Emergency Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests, #2 Text of Proposed Order B- Proposed Order)(Mathews, Ellen)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Khurram Nouman, filed by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3858523 (B4601113874). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Khurram Nouman, filed by MAG Industries Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MRR, ). (Mathews, Ellen) Modified on 6/8/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAG Industries Ltd v. Nouman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAG Industries Ltd
Represented By: Brooke Raylynn Watson
Represented By: Ellen T Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khurram Nouman
Represented By: Joseph E Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziz A Majeed
Represented By: Joseph E Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elements Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?